|
09/05/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 245, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 6348.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 5169.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 17. Page 3797.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|