California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB282 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 5, 2018

Amended

Bill May 16, 2018
Bill March 15, 2018
Bill January 3, 2018