|
09/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 592, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 2. Page 7010.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 5952.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4828.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|