California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2876 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2018

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill June 12, 2018