|
08/24/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 195, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5167.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4646.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|