California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2908 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2018

Amended

Bill August 6, 2018
Bill July 2, 2018
Bill June 14, 2018
Bill April 17, 2018