|
09/30/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 1000, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 6731.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5647.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 32. Page 5634.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
(pending re-referral to Com. on NAT. RES.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4674.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|