California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2923 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2018

Amended

Bill August 17, 2018
Bill July 2, 2018
Bill April 30, 2018
Bill April 11, 2018