Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|