California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2957 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Amended

Bill May 1, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018
Bill April 11, 2018
Bill March 20, 2018