|
09/26/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 772, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6379.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 5276.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 5253.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|