California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3022 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2018

Amended

Bill August 6, 2018
Bill May 16, 2018