|
08/27/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 203, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 6204.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5169.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 3. Page 3798.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (January 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & R. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 4). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|