LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB306
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB306
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB306
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 6, 2017
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 10, 2018
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
August 27, 2018
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 20, 2018
Compare
Bill
May 16, 2018
Compare
Bill
January 11, 2018
Compare
Bill
January 3, 2018
Compare
Bill
March 23, 2017
Compare