|
08/29/2018
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 6244.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 5231.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
(Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5231.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Reconsideration of favorable vote granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5230.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 5250.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|