California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3069 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 14, 2018

Amended

Bill June 27, 2018
Bill May 14, 2018
Bill March 23, 2018