|
09/29/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 925, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6842.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5805.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5218.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|