California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3126 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2018

Amended

Bill August 20, 2018
Bill June 21, 2018
Bill April 19, 2018
Bill March 23, 2018