|
10/08/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 578, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/20/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 3309.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3206.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2710.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 4. Page 2064.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1649.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|