California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB314 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2017

Amended

Bill September 6, 2017
Bill August 22, 2017
Bill May 22, 2017
Bill April 27, 2017
Bill March 22, 2017