Assembly | 05/25/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2018 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |