|
08/28/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 243, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6246.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5234.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 5588.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5435.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 5434.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|