California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 14, 2018

Chaptered

Bill August 28, 2018

Amended

Bill July 5, 2018
Bill June 21, 2018
Bill May 29, 2018
Bill April 30, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018