|
09/27/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 312, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3016.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2455.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1486.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|