California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB347 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2018

Amended

Bill August 20, 2018
Bill June 18, 2018