|
10/02/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 400, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2918.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2350.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1478.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|