California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB352 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2017

Amended

Bill July 17, 2017
Bill June 29, 2017
Bill April 6, 2017
Bill March 27, 2017