|
10/03/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 440, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/26/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2017
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3521.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2937.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mendoza.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1389.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|