California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB394 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2017

Amended

Bill September 5, 2017
Bill March 30, 2017