|
09/11/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 224, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2755.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2180.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1264.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|