California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB400 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 11, 2017

Amended

Bill July 13, 2017
Bill April 3, 2017