|
10/14/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 779, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 44. Noes 27. Page 3135.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2497.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 1638.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1471.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|