California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB424 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 14, 2017

Amended

Bill August 30, 2017
Bill June 19, 2017
Bill May 11, 2017