|
01/12/2018
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2018
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2017
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/19/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3120.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2518.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2470.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|