California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB524 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2017

Amended

Bill August 28, 2017
Bill June 8, 2017
Bill May 10, 2017
Bill April 18, 2017