Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held without recommendation.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 4881.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 1474.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|