|
09/01/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2179.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 1420.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|