California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB551 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 1, 2017

Amended

Bill April 18, 2017
Bill March 13, 2017