|
10/06/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 528, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/19/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3107.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2513.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1822.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|