Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3779.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|