California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB608 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2017

Amended

Bill August 9, 2018
Bill July 2, 2018
Bill February 13, 2018
Bill January 3, 2018
Bill May 3, 2017
Bill March 1, 2017