|
01/12/2018
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2018
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2017
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3013.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2457.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2017
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2017
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2071.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1483.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2017
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/08/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/07/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|