California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB61 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2017

Amended

Bill August 23, 2017
Bill July 5, 2017
Bill March 23, 2017