|
10/15/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 818, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/15/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 4. Page 3018.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 6. Page 2458.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1528.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|