California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB634 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 15, 2017

Amended

Bill August 28, 2017
Bill August 22, 2017
Bill July 5, 2017
Bill June 19, 2017
Bill May 4, 2017
Bill March 23, 2017