Assembly | 01/09/2018 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2018 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2017 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/19/2017 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2017 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 12/14/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 13. | ||
Assembly | 12/13/2016 | Introduced. To print. |