|
09/29/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 6083.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 5778.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Anderson.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1617.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|