California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB724 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Amended

Bill August 27, 2018
Bill August 24, 2018
Bill August 20, 2018
Bill July 3, 2017
Bill June 20, 2017
Bill April 26, 2017
Bill April 20, 2017
Bill March 20, 2017