|
10/02/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 410, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3373.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2761.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2017
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1128.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|