California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB727 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2017

Amended

Bill September 5, 2017
Bill July 19, 2017
Bill June 12, 2017